Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First Mutual Sales Finance, A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Downey Brand Llp, against Gehres, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Christopher J. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management218 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty(Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions186 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2010 | |||
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
September 13, 2010 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KATHLEEN GEHRES. | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR PLACED IN FILE |
|
July 07, 2010 |
Judge: Warner, Christopher J |
||
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC/DISMISSAL-NONDISPOSITIONED DEFENDANTS CHRISTOPHER J WARNER PRESIDING. (AWAY FROM COURT) CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON NOT REPORTED - ATTORNEY INFORMATION ATTORNEY L. BROWN (TELECOM) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEA |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S35 FOR HRG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.