Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Zapata, Rudy, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Cynthia Ann Ludvigsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2010 | |||
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
May 07, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN PRESIDING. CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HE |
|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S34 FOR HEARING |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091102-3965-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.