Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Glover, Denise, Glover, Patrick, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stephen P Collette& Associates, against Emc Mortgage Corporation A Delaware Corporation, Home Advantage Funding Group, Inc., A California Corporation, The First American Corporation, A California Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., A Minnesota Corporation, represented by Alvarado Smith, Litchfield Cavo Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
Time To Management290 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions434 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time541 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2011 |
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AND DISMISS CASE JOHN M PACHECO,JUDGE CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PATRICK GLOVER, DENISE GLOVER - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION H |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER DATED 2-15-11 RECEIVED BACK FROM STEPHEN P COLLETTE & ASSOCIATE. | |
February 15, 2011 |
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
February 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL UNSERVED DEFENDANTS JOHN M PACHECO,JUDGE CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PATRICK GLOVER, DENISE GLOVER, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., A MINNESOTA, |
|
February 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
January 03, 2011 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO AMEND AFTER DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT EMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION A DELAWARE JANET M FRANGIE,JUDGE CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA;12152 COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.