Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dominguez, Rachel Renee, Espinoza, Corrina Ilene, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Christopher J. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2009 |
CategoryPetition Re Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100517-3038-CS MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 0.50 PAYMT | |
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 091207-0708-CS MJF/ 50.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT | |
November 16, 2009 |
Judge: Warner, Christopher J |
||
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name filed. DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM CORRINA ILENE ESPONIZA TO CORRINA ILENE DOMINGUEZ FILED. |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: NAME CHANGE CHRISTOPHER J WARNER PRESIDING. CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER, RACHEL DOMINGUEZ PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - COURT FINDS |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S35 FOR HEARING |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHANGE OF NAME FILED. | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S35 | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME OF RACHEL RENEE DOMINGUEZ, CORRINA ILENE ESPINOZA IS ADDED AS A PTNR. |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED (CIVIL) 091005-2198-CS CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.