Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Canterbury Lots-68, Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Madden, James David, against California Reconveyance Company, Master Financial, Inc, represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado & Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Alvarez, Donald presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint For Damages |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time552 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY (NOT) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. THEODORE BACON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COM |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: PUT FILE IN S32 BIN FOR HEARING |
|
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
February 14, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY JAMES D MADDEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY MICHAEL TANNATT PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed REPLY TO PLA DENNIS ROUNDS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PERFORMANCE SERVICES,INC'S MSJ FILED |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP32 |
|
January 12, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.