Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Calderon, Irving G, Gallardo, Veronica, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ward & Ward, against Davila, Francisco, Gallardo, Veronica, represented by Schauer, Robert Frederick, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Cheryl A. Houde presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time636 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2011 | |||
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY IRVING G CALDERON. |
|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- ENTIRE PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 24, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY ROBERT F SCHAUER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/ |
|
May 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP32 |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY IRVING G CALDERON. |
|
April 12, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY WILLIAM J WARD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY ROBERT F SCHAUER PRESENT FOR FR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.