Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City Of Fontana, A Municipal Corporation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Best Best & Krieger, Llp, against All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest Inthe Property, Federal National Mortgage Association, Shanely,, Linda S, Verdugo Trustee Service Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Frangie, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Set Aside Default of SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE VERDUGO TRUSTEE SERVICE CORPORATION. |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT VERDUGO TRUSTEE SERVICE CORPORATION. | |
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF FONTANA,. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS IN CONDEMNATION AS TO APN 1110-141-14 FILED |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.