Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mann Bracken, Llp, against Ramirez, Cresencio, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Frank J. Gafkowski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time358 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2010 |
Judge: Gafkowski, Frank |
||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 FRANK GAFKOWSKI,JUDGE CLERK: LORI MOWLES COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE |
|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP37 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 9/24/10 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37 | |
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CRESENCIO RAMIREZ SERVED ON 10/25/09 WITH FEES OF $60.00. |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.