Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bishop White Marshall & Weibel, Ps, against Kobler, Richard R, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time354 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2010 | |||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE: SERVICE/DISMISSAL/SANCTIONS (FT SERVE) |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S38 |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 9/24/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38 | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 9/24/10 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38 | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 9/24/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34 - RESCHEDULED TO: | |
June 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conformed Copies in the Attorney Bin - No Envelope Provided CONFORMED COPIES IN THE ATTORNEY BIN -- NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.