Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cir Law Offices Internation Llp, against Jackson, Tonya R, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions355 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time355 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $65.00. |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 8541.19 ) 110708-1648-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 110708-1648-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 144822 |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $598.88 | |
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 110121-3589-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 110121-3589-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 164355 | |
November 23, 2010 | |||
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
September 24, 2010 | |||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 CLERK'S CALENDAR CLERK: KIM ALLAIN NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY SUZANNE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TONYA R JACKSON - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISP |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S38 |
|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES 1-10 FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.