Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
O'Farrell, Richard, O'Farrell, Karen, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Christopher J. Warner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 01, 2009 |
CategoryPetition Re Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Balance Paid on Case $40.50 credit card paid 02/24/22 |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Copy Purchased. Number of Pages: | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 091210-1814-MC MJF/ 50.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0074301439 | |
November 16, 2009 |
Judge: Warner, Christopher J |
||
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name filed. DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM RIKKI RACHEL BENNETT-O'FARRELL TO RIKKI RACHEL O'FARRELL FILED. |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: NAME CHANGE CHRISTOPHER J WARNER PRESIDING. CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER, KAREN O'FARRELL PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - COURT FINDS |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC RE: NAME CHANGE BY PUUBLICATION ON 10/29/09 AS TO IN RE: RIKKI RACHEL BENNETT-O'FARRELL, FILED. |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S35 FOR HEARING |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY KAREN O'FARRELL FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 091019-1765-CK CLU/ 355.00 PAYMT 091019-1765-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 973 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.