Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ayala, Patricia, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Geoffrey H Hopper & Associates, against Roberts, Randi, Kelly Services, Inland Empire Health Plan, Nuckles, Ronald, Nuckles Oil Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Arias & Lockwood, Paul, Plevin, Sullivan, & Connaughton, Musick Peeler & Garrett, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M. Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management408 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time503 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2010 | |||
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY NUCKLES OIL INC FOR POSTAGE/ENVELOPE 101115-3655-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 101115-3655-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY NUCKLES OIL INC FOR FAX FILING OF DISMISSAL 101115-3650-VS FAX/ 5.00 PAYMT | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0034595633 | |
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY NUCKLES OIL INC, RONALD NUCKLES, RANDI ROBERTS. |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE TRACKED TO CALENDAR WALL |
|
October 20, 2010 | |||
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. JAMES BROOKS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NUCKLES OIL INC, RONALD NUCKLES, RANDI ROBERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.