Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A National Banking Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Dunning Law Firm, against Morales, Richard, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: FINAL RETURN TO COURT/WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,624.19 |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 14053.95 ) 101222-0202-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 101222-0202-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1877690 |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,404.76 | |
June 04, 2010 | |||
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $12,756.45 ) 091218-4236-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 091218-4236-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 128529 |
|
December 11, 2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.