Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Moore Law Group, against Sandoval, Carlos M, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,049.95) |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 10424.65 ) 180306-0401-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180306-0401-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 971126 |
|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 7468.34 ) 131211-1048-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 131211-1048-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 46463 |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,093.64 | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Credits Filed. Credits in the Amount of DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,414.74 FILED. |
|
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 11371.84 ) 120912-0946-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 120912-0946-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 2947 |
|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,582.40 | |
September 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 10515.04 ) 110913-1850-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 110913-1850-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 82257 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.