Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mickell, Sidney Howard, against Porter, Merle T, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2010 | |||
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 04, 2009 | |||
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 5/28/10 |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34T | |
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CACH, LLC AS TO MERLE T PORTER. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.