Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sacro Libao, Alessandria Rosario, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Does 1 Through 10, Fca Us, Llc, Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, represented by Bowman & Brooke Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Motion re:
Date: July 12, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Court Order Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Reply Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: December 11, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Reply Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 09, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: August 27, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 09, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 17, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: October 12, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Reply Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 26, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 26, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: April 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 13, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: October 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial Judicial Officer Ochoa, Gilbert Hearing Time 10:00 AM | |
March 06, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
March 02, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Readiness Conference Judicial Officer Ochoa, Gilbert Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment / OSC re: Dismissal | |
March 02, 2023 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed Filed by Plaintiff Alessandra R.S. Libao on Complaint |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed on defendants FCA US, LLC and Moss Bros, Inc. DBA Moss Bros Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram's Demurrer as to plaintiff's sixth and seventh causes of action and FCA US, LLC'S motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike |
|
November 17, 2021 | Hearing | Motion to Strike Judicial Officer Ochoa, Gilbert Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment DEFENDANT FCA US, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION GARRETT B. STANTON . Filed by defendants FCA US, LLC, and Moss Bros, Inc filed on first amended complaint filed 8/26/21 | |
November 17, 2021 | Hearing | Demurrer Judicial Officer Ochoa, Gilbert Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment DEFENDANTS FCA US LLC AND MOSS BROS, INC. DBA MOSS BROS CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION GARRETT B. STANTON. Filed by defendants FCA US, LLC, and Moss bros, Inc filed on first amended complaint filed 8/26/21DEFENDANTS FCA US LLC AND MOSS BROS, INC. DBA MOSS BROS CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE SIXTH AND SEVENTH CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION GARRETT B. STANTON. Filed by defendants FCA US, LLC, and Moss bros, Inc filed on first amended complaint filed 8/26/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.