Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Taylor, Tyson, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Law Office Of Robert William Morris, against Does 1-25, Work4Good, A California Corporation, represented by Law Offices Of Geoffrey G Melkonian, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Complaint - Real Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified first amended complaint filed by Tyson Taylor against the defendant, WORK4GOOD, a California non-profit corporation. The plaintiff alleges that he is the owner of a residence located at 333 Maple Drive in Lake Arrowhead, ...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 22, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 22, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 22, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: April 30, 2021Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 06, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 21, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Answer Filed
Date: October 01, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.