Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Durazo, Edward, Durazo, Jesus, Durazo Jr., Ramiro, Durazo, Mariza, Durazo, Olga, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Perona,Langer, Beck, Serbin & Harrison, Robinson Calcagnie, Inc, against Chakhalov, Ramil, Converse Inc, Does 5 To 100, Logistics Dynamics, Llc, Ruiz, Christopher, (total of 9) See All represented by Chapman & Gluckman, Jawlakian Law Group, A.P.C., Kaye, Rose & Partners, Llp, Kutak Rock, Llp, Schulz Brick & Rogaski, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is an amendment to a previous complaint in a legal case. The plaintiff, Mariza Durazo et al., is filing an amendment to the complaint to correct the name of one of the defendants. The true name of the defendant is Mauricio Birjilio Rod...
Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: October 13, 2020Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: October 26, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration re:
Date: June 24, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 15, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: May 05, 2021Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: October 26, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: May 07, 2021Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 12, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 01, 2022Application for Order Filed re:
Date: April 14, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: August 24, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 16, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 10, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 02, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 01, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: March 12, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 23, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: March 22, 2024(Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opp Electronic Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Amendment to Cross-Complaint
Date: May 05, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: September 27, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Motion re:
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration re:
Date: May 23, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 19, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: February 22, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 06, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 29, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 07, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 24, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 20, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 18, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: April 10, 2024Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: September 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 01, 2022Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: March 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 21, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 01, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 04, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: March 07, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: August 24, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 01, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: February 18, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 14, 2022Index of Exhibits
Date: March 01, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 02, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: June 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 02, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: December 01, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: March 26, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 09, 2023Objection Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: June 13, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 10, 2023Objection Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Reply Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Application for
Date: February 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2024(Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opp Electronic Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 26, 2024Separate Statement ISO Motion Filed Electronically
Date: February 06, 2024Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: February 06, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: March 26, 2024Declaration re:
Date: May 23, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 12, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: March 22, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 18, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 29, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 25, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 02, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: October 14, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 06, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 06, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Reply Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 12, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 12, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 22, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: November 17, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 19, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: December 07, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 22, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 21, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 01, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 02, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: August 24, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 01, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: September 30, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 09, 2023Objection Filed
Date: March 26, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 14, 2023Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: March 21, 2023Objection Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Answer Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 29, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: March 21, 2023Objection Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 21, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 03, 2024Reply Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Objection Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 25, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document(s) received via FileSubmit Notice sent to Priority |
|
April 23, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed DEFENDANT CONVERSE INC.S, NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO TAKE MOTION OFF-CALENDAR |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT CONVERSE INC.S OFFER TO COMPROMISE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 998 TO PLAINTIFFS |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed To Continue Trial and Trial Related Dates |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20.00 chk paid for stip fees |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
(Proposed) Order re Evidentiary Obj ISO Opp Electronic Filed [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS LOGISTIC DYNAMICS AND SPECTRAN TRANSPORTATIONS OBJECTIONS PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.