Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Villegas, Maria, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Office Of Scott Ernest Wheeler, against Does 1-50, Myojo Usa, Inc., Square One Staffing, represented by Korey Richardson Llp, Law Office Of Gene H. Shioda, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2020 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The case number is 2 CIVDS2020848. The plaintiff, Maria Villegas, is suing the defendants, Myojo USA, Inc. and Square One Staffing, for various cl...
Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order
Date: May 16, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: January 24, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 21, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 21, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 21, 2023Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: April 21, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 21, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: May 15, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: May 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Declaration re:
Date: April 21, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: September 25, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 08, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 25, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 25, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 08, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: May 05, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: May 14, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 28, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 25, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2022Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $9 credit card paid 06/12/23 for fax |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Order and Judgment Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Tentative decisions | |
May 15, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
May 15, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Granted. Final Approval of Class Action Settlements Settlement of a class action requires court approval. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.769.) The moving party must demonstrate that “the settlement is f... | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Supplemental declaration of Kevin Lee regarding settlement notice administration |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Villegas |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Justin A. Wheeler in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.