Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Brussard, James, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by The Barry Law Firm, against Does 1 Through 20, General Motors, Llca Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Erskine Law Group, Apc, Erskine Law Group, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 27, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: December 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 02, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: February 10, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: September 21, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 02, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 21, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 18, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 18, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 18, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 05, 2023Reply Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: February 10, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Trial Setting Order filed
Date: October 05, 2022Motion re:
Date: October 18, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: November 22, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Trial Brief Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Statement of Case Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Declaration re:
Date: February 10, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 21, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 16, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 23, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 28, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: April 12, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 20, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Motion re:
Date: February 26, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Objection Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: April 06, 2021Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 15, 2021Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 12, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 13, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: April 12, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: March 16, 2021Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: November 29, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Motion re:
Date: August 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 10, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: December 11, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 18, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 26, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 19, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 16, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: May 18, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
March 20, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion for Attorney's fees and Costs |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
December 14, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Order re: 10/13/23 hearing regarding expert witness |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed NOTICE OF RULING: TRIAL (Notices) |
|
November 27, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) (Notices) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice Of Hearing On Defendant General Motors LLCs Motion For Reconsideration Of The Courts October 13, 2023, Order Imposing Discovery Sanctions Against Defendant (Notices) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.