Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Corona, Maria Ochoa, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Fernando D Vargas, against Cardenas Market An Unknown Business Entity, Cardenas Markets, Llc, Does 2-50 Inclusive, represented by Warriner Green & Riley, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Bryan Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: April 17, 2024Answer Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 14, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: August 14, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 14, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 04, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 28, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: July 14, 2023Memorandum Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
April 18, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) Filed by plaintiff on 4/17/24 |
|
August 21, 2023 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
August 17, 2023 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
July 18, 2023 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: to Continue Trial Dates |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Requesting Order to Continue Trial Date |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed iSO Ex-Parte Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.