Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Tyson, Sherrie, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Barry Pasternack, Pro Se, against Arbaian, Dikran, Does 1-100, Ontario Cng Property, Llc A Business Entity Form Unknown, Ontario Cng Station, Inc A Business Entity Form Unknown, represented by Bordin Semmer Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Death Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 07, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: April 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 07, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: October 29, 2020Reply Filed
Date: December 16, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 18, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 25, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: March 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 19, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 07, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 09, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 24, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 29, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 21, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 18, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 07, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 10, 2020Declaration re:
Date: March 30, 2023Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 30, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 06, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 01, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 17, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 19, 2023Motion re:
Date: September 20, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 17, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted
Date: August 02, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: January 25, 2024Declaration re:
Date: July 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 18, 2023Notice Filed
Date: September 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 18, 2023Motion Re: Joinder Filed
Date: August 18, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 02, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Motion Re: Joinder Filed
Date: July 11, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: October 13, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 18, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 05, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: June 26, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: August 07, 2020Motion re:
Date: September 15, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: May 23, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 07, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: September 18, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Reply Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 10, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service Petition for Approval of Compromis od Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed DEFENDANTS ONTARIO CNG PROPERTY LLC, ONTARIO CNG STATION, INC AND DIKRAN ARABIAN'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS |
|
November 13, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed filed by Defendants filed on 11/2/23 |
|
November 01, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF, SHERRIE TYSON, TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS |
|
October 30, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60.00 check paid for motion fee |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed in Support of Motion fopr Judgment on the Pleadings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.