Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Coello, Alexandra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bral & Associates, against Torres, Maria A., represented by Masserman & Ducey, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Motion to Set Aside
Date: June 15, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: November 09, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 15, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 05, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: December 07, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Motion re:
Date: December 07, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: December 07, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 05, 2020Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 07, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: August 05, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 04, 2022Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 07, 2022Answer Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 13, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 18, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 05, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: November 05, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: April 06, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 29, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
January 09, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $240 paid via efile on 12/08 for mtns |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories Motion to Compel plaintiff's responses to demand for production of documents, set one |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Motion for an order deeming admitted truth of facts, filed by defendant Maria A. Torres |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc Motion to Compel plaintiff's responses to demand for production of documents, set one |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories Motion to Compel plaintiff's responses to special interrogatories, set one |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
October 11, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.