Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Camarena Perez, Maria Victoria, Jauregui Ruano, Martha Leticica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Does 3-50, Hertz, Llc., Hertz Vehicles, Llc, Johnson, Austin Karl, The Hertz Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Ford, Walker, Haggerty & Behar, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 19, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 19, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Individual Party)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 29, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: December 30, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.