Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Finishmaster, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alan L Brodkin & Associates, against Aeropro, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Does 1-10, Inclusive, Ermalovich, Joseph, represented by The Law Office Of Jeffrey G Jacobs, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: December 02, 2022Answer Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 19, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 23, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 06, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 19, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: April 07, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: April 09, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: August 13, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 17, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 25, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: September 02, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: December 03, 2021Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration in Support of Interest Calculation
Date: December 03, 2021Judgment by Court filed
Date: February 25, 2022Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: April 01, 2022ORAP Returned Served
Date: September 19, 2022ORAP Returned Served
Date: October 10, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 13, 2022Bench Warrant Returned from Sheriff's Unserved
Date: December 02, 2022Application and Order For
Date: February 09, 2023Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: February 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 17, 2021Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: December 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application and Order For Alan L. Brodkin Re: Recall of Bench Warrant |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Comment: Original Civil Bench Warrant Recall Sent to Sheriff's Central Civil Office via interoffice mail |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of: | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant Returned from Sheriff's Unserved Returned - Unserved |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Warrant Sent to Sheriff's Office for Service San Bernardino County |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Bench Warrant-- Form is Incomplete. Address for Levying Officer is Required. Please Correct and Resubmit |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORAP Returned Served Filed by Plaintiff as to Defendant/Creditor Joseph Ermalovich |
|
October 10, 2022 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORAP Returned Served By Plaintiff Finishmaster |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.