Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Indrawan, Christina, Indrawan, Elmer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cline, Apc., against Fca Us Llc, represented by Bowman & Brooke Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2020 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 19, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 19, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: September 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.