Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Battle, Naayshon, Chavez, Maria, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Capstone Law Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Telecare Corporation, A California Corporation, represented by Seyfarth Shaw Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiffs, Naayshon Battle and Maria Chavez, are filing a class action lawsuit against Telecare Corporation, a California corpor...
Notice Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 01, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 20, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 03, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 03, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: August 20, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 13, 2020Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 29, 2020Declaration re:
Date: February 26, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Motion to Stay
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 11, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 11, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 24, 2021Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: March 24, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: March 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Reply Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination of Add-On
Date: October 04, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 25, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.