Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flores, Sergio Lee Andrew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Jonathan M Kashani, against Jasper Auto Group, Inc., Kessenger, Ashley, represented by Manning Gross & Massenburg, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint appears to be a personal injury case. The plaintiff, Sergio Lee Andrew Flor, is alleging causes of action against the defendant, Ashley Kessenger Jasper Auto Group Inc. The complaint mentions that the action is a limited civil case, wi...
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: July 20, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: August 25, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: July 19, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Declaration re:
Date: May 24, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Motion re:
Date: May 24, 2022Answer Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 27, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: July 31, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: July 31, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 08, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 02, 2022Motion re:
Date: March 18, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 31, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 31, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 07, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 14, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: February 17, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: March 19, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: March 19, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Reply to Motion re:
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 14, 2021Reply Filed
Date: April 15, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: June 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: June 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: June 18, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: June 30, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: July 07, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoenas Destroyed | |
October 17, 2022 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
October 13, 2022 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
October 10, 2022 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
October 10, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed With Prejudice filed by plaintiff Sergio Lee Andrew Flores |
|
September 12, 2022 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Balance Paid on Case $60.00 Ck for motion fee paid on 9.7.22 |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Request for Dismissal is being returned by the court for the following reason(s): Plaintiff has a balance of $60.00 due on the case. Balance must be paid before case is dismissed. |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional) Filed by plaintiff Sergio Lee Andrew Flores on complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.