Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Gladden, Karim, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Downtown L.A. Law Group, Downtown La Law Group, against Acosta, Josette, City Of San Bernardino A Public Entity, County Of San Bernardino A Public Entity, Does 5-50, Family Mennonite Church, (total of 9) See All represented by Deputy County Counsel, Hall Griffin Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: December 22, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: January 28, 2022Motion re:
Date: November 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 01, 2022Ntc of Entry of Default Filed and Fwd to the Court of Appeal
Date: January 24, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 01, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 10, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 04, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 04, 2023Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: April 04, 2022Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: March 22, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Advanced Jury Fees Posted
Date: April 14, 2023Remittitur Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 06, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 25, 2022Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: June 06, 2022Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: August 26, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 28, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 28, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: June 17, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: March 20, 2023Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 04, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: August 12, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: September 15, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: February 26, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 16, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 12, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 12, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Objection Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: August 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: October 27, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 30, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: September 30, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: May 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: December 07, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: July 13, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 13, 2020Conversion event
Date: September 11, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 09, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 28, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Amended Answer deemed filed
Date: March 02, 2021Motion to Amend Answer
Date: January 11, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: July 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 22, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 22, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 11, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Purchased 1 certified copy of Amended Judgment |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 $41.50 waived for certified copy |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: Judgment |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Dismissal as to Ann Hyde is being returned. Party was dismissed in open court on 04/12/23 |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Dismissal as to Paul Hyde is being returned. Party was dismissed in open court on 04/12/23 |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Dismissal as to Josette Acosta is being returned. Party was dismissed in open court on 04/12/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.