Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Hector, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Martinian & Associates Inc, against 25847 E 9Th Street, Llc, Anza Management Company, A Corporation, Carmona, Schochill C, Chavez, Schochill C, Does 2 Through 50, (total of 7) See All represented by Binder And Kalioundji, Llp, Lee, Clayton, The Cameron Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tomberlin, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTomberlin, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: April 23, 2021Notice
Date: October 07, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 12, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: April 22, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 22, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 17, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: October 30, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 04, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 04, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 22, 2020Amended Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 03, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: October 07, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 15, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 18, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 12, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 12, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 19, 2023Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2021Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 12, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 22, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 20, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 02, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: October 05, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 18, 2023Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: October 15, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 22, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Answer Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: June 22, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: April 03, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 19, 2023Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: October 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
July 18, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 26, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 08, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 04, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial Brief Filed Electronically DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF |
|
March 01, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Courts Ruling at October 12, 2023 Trial Readiness Conference |
|
October 16, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: #3 to exclude reference to an alleged failure by pltf. to mitigate damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.