Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Harley-Davidson Credit Corp. As Asg Of Eaglemark Savings Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Prober & Raphael Alaw Corporation, against Morin, John, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 30, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 30, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: June 30, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 05, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 30, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 22, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Judgment by Court filed
Date: April 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.