Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Corso, Craig Anthony, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quill & Arrow, Llp, against Nissan Northamerica, Inc A California Corporation, represented by Sweeney Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 13, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Motion re:
Date: January 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 20, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 10, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: June 10, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 10, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed re:
Date: May 01, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Answer Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 13, 2023Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action
Date: March 13, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 11, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: November 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Declaration re:
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: Hill, Charlie L, Jr. |
||
November 27, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
November 22, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Daniel O. Nivkfardjam Re Plaintiffs Failure to Appear |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed re: Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings on April 27,2023 |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
April 27, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.