Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Valencia, Margarita, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Office Of David W Allor, against Baer, Sierra, represented by Knapp, Petersen & Clarke, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 24, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 29, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 26, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 29, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.