Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Garcia, Sara, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by West Coast Employment Lawyers, Aplc, against Beinspired Inc, Nites, Inn, A California Business Organization, represented by Sheth Law, Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 06, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 16, 2020Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed
Date: October 29, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 28, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 22, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 30, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: March 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.