Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pimentel, Diane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bond Sanchez-Gordon Llp, Vaziri Law Group, Vaziri Law Group, Apc, against Cvs Transportation Llc, Mitchell, Edward, represented by La Follette Johnson Dehaas Fesler & Ames, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 17, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 01, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: May 29, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: September 27, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: October 21, 2020Declaration re:
Date: September 13, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 13, 2023Order signed and filed.
Date: September 28, 2023Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 29, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 27, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: September 21, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Association of Attorney Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Answer Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 25, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 21, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
February 08, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
October 17, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order signed and filed. | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Comment: File was not sent to dept. for ex parte hearing on 9/28/23. The dept. does not have the file. |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
September 28, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for an order to continue the Trial date filed by All Defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.