Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
11272 Palmdale Road Property Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Maida, Maida, Guru Investments Llc. A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Bleau Fox, Aplc, Bleau Fox & Associates, against Guru Investments Llc A California Limited Liability Company, represented by Fransen & Molinaro, Hall Griffin Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 01, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: July 20, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: July 22, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 30, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 01, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 13, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Evidence re:
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 18, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 28, 2022Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: September 22, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.