Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Unifund Ccr, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Nolasco-Gomez, Kevin S, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 12, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 12, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 | |||
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: discharge - chapter 7 |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case. Bankruptcy case number 6:20-bk-17035-MH. |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEVIN S NOLASCO-GOMEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/27/20 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED. |
|
September 14, 2020 | |||
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24. |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.