Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lbs Financial Credit Union A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Prenovost, Normandin, Dawe & Rocha, against De La Cruz, Hilario, De La Cruz, Hilario Ramon, The State Of California Acting By And Through The California Depart, represented by Brian G Soublet, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 05, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 21, 2020Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 05, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 01, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: September 03, 2020Conversion event
Date: September 09, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 01, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: October 09, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: October 22, 2020Declaration & Order re:
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: February 09, 2021Judgment by Court filed
Date: November 19, 2020Notice Filed
Date: May 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.