Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, Esq, against Reyes, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 20, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 20, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: February 20, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: August 18, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 18, 2020Notice Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: April 27, 2021Stipulated Judgment Filed
Date: April 27, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.