Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, Hunt & Henriques, Llp, against Gasperich, Jessica G, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff in this case is Citibank N.A., and the defendant is Jessica G. Gasperich. The complaint is related to a contract dispute. The jurisd...
Notice of Filing Bankruptcy Petition and Stay
Date: June 23, 2020Complaint Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 10, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: February 10, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 10, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: June 23, 2020Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
February 05, 2021 | |||
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF BK |
|
December 28, 2020 | |||
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE (CHAPTER 7) FILED. |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 05, 2020 | |||
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: LETTER TO HUNT & HENRIQUES RECEIVED BACK FROM USPS. | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY JESSICA G GASPERICH; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:20-BK-14165-SC. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.