Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Baker, Timothy, Galloway, Clifford, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw Llp, against D & M Carriers, Llc, A Limited Liability Company, represented by Scopelitis,Garvin,Light,Hanson& Feary,Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2020 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 06, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 25, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 27, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 25, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 25, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transfer Received
Date: March 09, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 17, 2020Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: February 04, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Motion re:
Date: November 10, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 30, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 08, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 11, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: February 10, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 10, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 10, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 15, 2021Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Status Report Filed
Date: September 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.