Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nava, Lorraine, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of David Azizi, against The Vons Companies, Inc, represented by Stone Dean Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2020 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: January 31, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: January 31, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 31, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 28, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 02, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 16, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 15, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 15, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 15, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 24, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 24, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 24, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 24, 2022Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 21, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoenas Destroyed | |
January 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Request for Dismissal is being returned by the court for the following reason(s): Duplicate submission, request filed 10/31/22. |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed With prejudice |
|
October 31, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): dismissal court fees have not been paid |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fax Received request for dismissal/letter |
|
September 06, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
September 01, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
August 29, 2022 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
August 29, 2022 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.