Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N.A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collection At Law,Inc., against Watson, Jeffrey S, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2020 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Filed Re:
Date: January 18, 2022Civil Case Initiated and Party Information Entered
Date: January 29, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 29, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: January 29, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 29, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration of Non-Military Service
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Judgment by Clerk filed
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration in Support of Entry of Judg under CCP 1033 filed
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Entire Case Stayed)
Date: October 08, 2021Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: January 26, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.