Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Black, Ruby, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law, Patricia Anne, against Bergey M.D M.D., Darren, Colton Ca Multi Asc Lp, Premier Outpatient Surgery Center, Inc, Premier Surgery Center, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, (total of 6) See All represented by Law Offices Of Michael D Gonzalez, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Murchison & Cumming, Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Rafael Arreola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRafael Arreola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: January 22, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 08, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 06, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 07, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: July 22, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: September 20, 2020Notice of NSF Check Mailed to
Date: August 06, 2025Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Amended Answer Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 07, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.