Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Second Round Sub, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Farmar Law Group Pc, against Fierro Vidana, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 21, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: December 05, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 18, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: July 06, 2020Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | |||
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON REBECCA FIERRO VIDANA. | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT ON ACCOUNT STATED FILED. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC AS TO REBECCA FIERRO VIDANA. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ASSIGNMENT * FILED. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF DEBT BUYER CCP 1788.60 FILED |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ALI FARZIN CCP 1033 FILED |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/20 JUDGMENT FOR: SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: REBECCA FIERRO VIDANA JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,928.54 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $291.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2219.54 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.