Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kearns, Joseph, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Phillips, Gordon Glen, against Does 1-100, Hi-Desert Medical Center, Klempen D.O., Jeffrey, Smith, M.D., Eldene A, represented by Agajanian Mcfall Weiss Tetreault & Crist, Agajanian Mcfall Weiss & Tetreault Llp, Walker Law Group Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 02, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 12, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 17, 2020Declaration re:
Date: November 16, 2022Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: November 22, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 06, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 18, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 10, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Reply to Motion re:
Date: February 25, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: March 25, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: April 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Answer Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 14, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 28, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 22, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: December 14, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: December 15, 2021Evidence re:
Date: January 10, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2022Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: April 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: April 21, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 26, 2022Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: declaration of Susan Heider in response to order to show cause |
|
October 11, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of 10/6/22 minute order. |
|
October 06, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Cannot dismiss to entire action with an active judgment on the case. |
|
September 26, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
September 22, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
September 14, 2022 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
September 02, 2022 | Department S34 - SBJC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.