Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Casa, Cinthia, Soto, Enrique, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Knight Law Group Llp, against Does 1-10, Kia Motors America, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Lehrman Law Group, Lehrman, Villegas, Chinery & Douglas, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 09, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: October 09, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 05, 2020Conversion event
Date: July 27, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 21, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 27, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 04, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 04, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Reply Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: May 04, 2022Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: May 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 14, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: December 07, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Objection Filed
Date: February 15, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 05, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Off Calendar Request Filed
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Response Filed to:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Exhibits List Filed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Witness List Filed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine re:
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.