Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Silverman Theologou, Llp, against Llanos Jr., Juan J., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: September 23, 2019Declaration re:
Date: September 23, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 23, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 18, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Conversion event
Date: September 03, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 08, 2020Declaration of Accrued Interest in the Amount of
Date: July 02, 2021Default Judgment Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.