Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Cercado, Esteban L, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2019 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: October 22, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 10, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: September 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | |||
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 20, 2020 | |||
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY |
|
March 10, 2020 | |||
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE FOR CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY FILED. |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.