Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perez Ramirez, Paulino, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Walmart Inc., Walmart, Inc A Corporation, represented by Kohn, Andrew Nicholas, Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 08, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: August 08, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 20, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 09, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 18, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 21, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 05, 2020Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: November 10, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous Opposition Filed
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Reply to Motion re:
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional)
Date: June 03, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: June 29, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.